Trustees CONSUMERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES SAMUEL YOUNGER Chair 01 January 2020
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN WOOLARD CBE Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
KEVIN HARRY GASKELL Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
DOROTHY MARIE BURWELL Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
RICHARD DAVID SIBBICK Trustee 23 November 2019
None on record
MELANIE GRIFFITHS Trustee 23 November 2019
None on record
Charles David WANDER Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
DAVID PETER WOODWARD Trustee 11 December 2018
None on record
CHRISTINE FORDE Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
SHARON MARGARET GRANT OBE Trustee 06 February 2018
BERNIE GRANT CENTRE PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
THE BERNIE GRANT TRUST
Received: On time
CAROLINE MARY BAKER Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
BRIAN DOUGLAS YATES Trustee 31 January 2017
Research Institute for Disabled Consumers
Received: On time
Donald Grant Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record
SHIRLEY BAILEY-WOOD Trustee 26 January 2016
None on record