FRIENDS OF CHIPPING HILL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fundraise for Chipping Hill School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 09 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Buttress | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.78k | £7.40k | £650 | £9.58k | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.46k | £15.30k | £436 | £5.88k | £4.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 15 September 2020 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 7TH OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF CHIPPING HILL SCHOOL
Owers Road
WITHAM
ESSEX
CM8 1FR
- Phone:
- 01376512201
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window