Accounts and annual returns THE NEW MEDWAY STEAM PACKET COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 296236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window