Financial history THE NEW MEDWAY STEAM PACKET COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 296236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £98.72k £79.00k £91.47k £131.32k £115.42k
Total expenditure £91.09k £60.30k £66.11k £60.29k £43.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £40.00k