JAMAICAN MUTAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 18 March 1987: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- JAMAICA MUTUAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (JMCA) (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 23RD FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
1)TO ASSOCIATE THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION,RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE POOR,SICK OR AGED AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.2)TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF PETERBOROUGH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window