Accounts and annual returns THE INSPIRE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 296284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 17 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window