Financial history THE INSPIRE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 296284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £244.52k £240.64k £487.71k £257.79k £214.90k
Total expenditure £230.95k £304.71k £292.93k £334.58k £185.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A