Trustees THE INSPIRE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 296284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Reddin MBE Chair 30 June 2021
OUR SANSAR LIMITED
Received: On time
Joanne Suddaby-Smith Trustee 24 December 2019
None on record
David Temple Trustee 24 October 2019
None on record
Mary Mullin Trustee 25 October 2018
THE ROBIN AND LUCIENNE DAY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sue Borrett Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record
Emeritus Professor Peter Harry Ellaway BSc PhD Trustee 13 September 2018
None on record
Sarah Cann Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
Dr RICHARD SMITH Trustee 05 April 2016
None on record
JONATHAN RUDGE Trustee
None on record