HOUNSLOW ACTION FOR YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296372
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)