HOUNSLOW ACTION FOR YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £460.03k £476.73k £490.35k £303.98k £315.99k
Total expenditure £668.09k £657.14k £621.35k £390.00k £320.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £295.11k £223.26k £204.25k £111.06k £49.09k