HOUNSLOW ACTION FOR YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296372
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Amrit Sachar Trustee 23 February 2015
WILDERNESS TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Cherryl Martin Trustee 21 July 2015 None on record
Maeve Begley Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record
Mary Longhurst Chair 08 April 2019 None on record
Sofia Oumouassan Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
Ian Bryant Trustee 02 September 2019 None on record