CHARITY OF SIDNEY ARTHUR HARRIS FOR CHURCHYARD

Charity number: 296482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GIDEON EDWARD LACEY Trustee None on record
Mrs C Wells Trustee 28 April 2014
BERKSHIRE ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
Mrs S Smith Trustee 23 April 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
MR M.J TEBBOT Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
Elizabeth Wilks Trustee 10 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
Lynda Jane Marston-Weston Trustee 17 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
Geoffrey Beanland Trustee 17 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
Mardi Wilkins Trustee 10 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
REV S A Morton Trustee 14 October 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
MRS J.A. HUNT Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
Gillian Margaret Cruse Trustee 21 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
Jill Steward Trustee 27 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time
PAUL MARSTON-WESTON MBA Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HAMBLEDEN Received: On time