THE DYMPNA CENTRE

Charity number: 296650
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 May 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)