THE DYMPNA CENTRE

Charity number: 296650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £28.70k £28.70k £35.06k £23.15k £9.00k
Total expenditure £22.83k £22.83k £29.77k £18.80k £11.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A