ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH CHARITIES

Charity number: 296772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the Association is the charitable advancement of medical and health research in the United Kingdom generally and in particular the advancement and promotion of the collective effectiveness of those charities of which a principal activity is medical and health research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • A M R C (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Kathryn Louise Wood Chair 06 December 2022
None on record
Emily Elisheva Renee Reuben Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Professor Bryan Williams Trustee 05 December 2024
IN2SCIENCEUK.ORG
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF HYPERTENSION
Recently registered
Ashley Stewart Ball-Gamble Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Dr Thomas William Nutt Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Daniel John Burkwood Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Adam Patrick Cobham Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Daniel Victor Pavin Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Jean Robertson Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Jonathan Charles Grant Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Hilary May Evans-Newton Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Henrietta Katherine Braund Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Dr Douglas Elliot Brown Trustee 24 March 2020
None on record
Dr Alyson Joan Fox Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.08m £1.07m £1.20m £1.15m £1.31m
Total expenditure £1.08m £983.01k £1.02m £1.07m £1.14m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £718 £2.80k £1.14k £1.55k £2.06k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.07m £1.20m £1.14m £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.59k £443 £115 £3.59k £39.67k
Income - Other £24.79k £0 £0 £0 £45.40k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £983.01k £1.02m £1.07m £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.92k £7.82k £8.17k £13.40k £17.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £25.02k £26.21k £16.83k £3.32k £12.70k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.17m £1.81m £1.94m £948.29k £1.13m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£36.86k £0 £0 -£4.31k -£2.01k
Total liabilities £629.25k £1.23m £1.17m £80.42k £103.76k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Churchill House
Third Floor
35 Red Lion Square
London
Phone:
02080786042