Financial history AGE UK LEWISHAM AND SOUTHWARK

Charity number: 296862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.21m £2.13m £2.04m £2.12m £2.70m
Total expenditure £2.10m £2.23m £2.13m £2.14m £2.59m
Income from government contracts £322.89k N/A N/A £1 £1.70m
Income from government grants £1.21m £946.09k £1.40m £1.07m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £612.42k £1.45m £1.40m £48.26k £2.39m
Income - Other trading activities £68.58k £75.55k £51.63k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.52m £595.87k £571.40k £2.06m £299.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.39m
Income - Investment £8.66k £8.64k £11.32k £12.34k £7.89k
Income - Other £17 £0 £7.17k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.99m £2.11m £2.02m £2.06m £2.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.86k £118.19k £106.76k £77.64k £42.32k
Expenditure - Governance £29.98k £29.30k £0 £6.50k £6.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.86k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0