SELWORTHY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS OF SELWORTHY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296890
Charity reporting is overdue by 854 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 488 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 854 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 854 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required