SELWORTHY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS OF SELWORTHY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 296890
Charity reporting is overdue by 853 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £8.74k £8.69k £11.84k £3.50k £11.96k
Total expenditure £4.64k £13.33k £4.07k £5.62k £18.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0