Accounts and annual returns ARDENLINK LIMITED

Charity number: 297004
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 October 2021 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 28 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required