Financial history WOODHURST VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 297010
Charity reporting is overdue by 369 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.01k £6.18k £10.04k £10.04k £35.85k
Total expenditure £4.86k £4.81k £8.01k £8.01k £4.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £33.66k