Accounts and annual returns THE ILSE AMLOT CENTRE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN

Charity number: 297121
Charity reporting is overdue by 470 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 470 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 470 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window