Financial history THE ILSE AMLOT CENTRE FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN

Charity number: 297121
Charity reporting is overdue by 511 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £483.35k £384.43k £435.52k £441.68k £409.07k
Total expenditure £444.23k £455.69k £456.98k £457.85k £476.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £6.63k £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £216.68k £181.76k £215.69k £250.63k N/A