Accounts and annual returns PLAINSONG AND MEDIAEVAL MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 297147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2022 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 April 2021 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 March 2021 516 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 March 2019 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 January 2018 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required