THE WALLINGFORD CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wallingford Club meets weekly for two hours at the local community centre. The clients are adults, over 18, with learning disabilities, who live in and around Wallingford. Conversation, games, puzzles and light refreshments are on offer for the first hour followed by a disco. Themed evenings - Valentine's Day, St. George's Day, bingo, skittles, Halloween etc take place once a month.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 September 1987: Standard registration
- 19 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 April 2023: Funds transferred to 271843 WALLINGFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.12k | £2.41k | £1.81k | £2.87k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.85k | £1.87k | £1.76k | £40 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 01 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JUNE 1987 AS AMENDED 15 JANUARY 1990, AS FURTHER AMENDED 10 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE MENTAL HANDICAP BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH A MENTAL HANDICAP AGED 14 YEARS AND OVER.
Area of benefit
WALLINGFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window