Accounts and annual returns WEST BERKSHIRE MARRIAGE GUIDANCE TRUST

Charity number: 297187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window