Accounts and annual returns THE BENNETT KLEINWORT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297260
Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 194 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 194 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 559 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 559 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 925 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 925 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1290 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1290 days
Annual return 05 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1655 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1655 days