Financial history THE BENNETT KLEINWORT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297260
Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016
Total gross income £300 £304 £5.30k £312 £332
Total expenditure £6.20k £1.23k £1.23k £1.13k £2.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A