DAVID SOLOMONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £94.80k £119.27k £105.61k £111.83k £96.05k
Total expenditure £124.03k £102.00k £183.55k £107.56k £167.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A