Financial history THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION SOMERSET

Charity number: 297324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £61.10k £30.47k £39.92k £31.71k £34.04k
Total expenditure £40.63k £20.15k £50.00k £25.25k £13.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.00k