Trustees FELSTED CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 297351

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Frank Williams | Chair | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edward Hawkes | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Acres | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Learmonth | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Crisp | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TONY BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MURIEL ROBERTSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.