Financial history THE RICHARD CONDON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 297371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £924 £1.10k £1.57k £706 £1.06k
Total expenditure £1.60k £5.56k £1.00k £1.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A