Financial history PARTNERS FOR CHANGE ETHIOPIA

Charity number: 297391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £271.28k £143.00k £153.94k £95.24k £109.20k
Total expenditure £278.71k £162.44k £118.85k £101.60k £129.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A