READING OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A local amateur operatic society performing stage musicals/operetta, and concerts in aid of local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 10 September 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lewis Jordan Donnelly | Chair | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Hollamby | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Patrick Edwards | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cleo Emmeline King | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Emily Clarke | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Ulrich | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Parsonson | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Delun Jones | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.03k | £25.68k | £19.18k | £8.65k | £25.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.81k | £22.65k | £11.88k | £14.25k | £28.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JUNE 1987 as amended on 01 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Greenham Wood
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG12 7WJ
- Phone:
- 01344266130
- Email:
- enquiries@readingops.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window