CHORLEYWOOD COMMON YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of youth football matches and associated activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 September 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Neal | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Wright | Trustee | 21 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL HALLAM | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROY BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.34k | £110.79k | £121.72k | £134.30k | £202.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.96k | £109.26k | £158.49k | £135.14k | £177.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JULY 1987
Charitable objects
TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION FOR IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR BOYS UNDER 18. TO HELP EDUCATE BOYS UNDER 18 THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Blacketts Wood Drive
Chorleywood
Rickmansworth
WD3 5PY
- Phone:
- 07801509624
- Email:
- treasurer@ccyfc.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window