THE 7TH TONBRIDGE (EDEN VALLEY) SCOUT GROUP TRUST

Charity number: 297485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £3.43k £2.70k £1.81k £1.48k
Total expenditure £0 £1.58k £1.43k £1.49k £1.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A