THURROCK CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 297569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £618.95k £451.65k £548.24k £519.56k £892.27k
Total expenditure £643.07k £425.72k £548.11k £503.64k £637.90k
Income from government contracts £324.39k £208.48k £254.63k £245.52k £254.20k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £20.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £99.09k N/A £222.71k £183.26k £522.85k
Income - Other trading activities £519.84k N/A £323.89k £328.90k £305.97k
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23 N/A £29 £36 £26
Income - Other £0 N/A £1.61k £7.36k £63.43k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £643.07k N/A £548.11k £503.64k £637.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.60k N/A £5.72k £6.08k £6.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0