Financial history CYRIL CORDEN TRUST

Charity number: 297595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.00k £10.00k £24.02k £5.75k £8.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A