Accounts and annual returns THE MCCORQUODALE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297697
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 21 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 28 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 09 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window