Financial history THE MCCORQUODALE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297697
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £57.93k £57.85k £124.06k £42.18k £39.77k
Total expenditure £49.15k £70.75k £116.10k £76.99k £181.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A