LOWENDER PERAN

Charity number: 297769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.54k £19.79k £23.39k £23.08k £130
Total expenditure £25.65k £18.61k £23.21k £20.96k £2.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £5.00k £8.34k £6.75k N/A