CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, BATH

Charity number: 297863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 19 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 13 October 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 07 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 25 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required