CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, BATH

Charity number: 297863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £12.84k £14.90k £14.97k £13.40k £10.40k
Total expenditure £26.92k £13.34k £14.43k £11.60k £4.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A