VICTIM SUPPORT

Charity number: 298028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Evans Trustee 05 May 2021 None on record
Andrew Edwards Trustee 02 November 2017 None on record
Clarisse Mallem Trustee 26 November 2021 None on record
Kathryn Adkins Trustee 14 November 2018 None on record
Roger Harding Trustee 02 November 2017 None on record
Rachel Onikosi Trustee 28 May 2021 None on record
Andrew David Tivey Chair 26 October 2016 None on record
Amanda Hamilton-Stanley Trustee 05 May 2021 None on record