Trustees BRISTOL INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 298035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEWART NORTH Chair
BRISTOL NOISE
Received: On time
Lance Christopher Mason Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Christine Rogers Trustee 12 February 2020
None on record
Joanne Appleton Trustee 01 February 2016
EUROPEAN CHRISTIAN MISSION (BRITAIN)
Received: On time
ANDREW STREET Trustee 25 July 2013
COMMUNITY INITIATIVES SOUTH WEST LIMITED
Received: On time
SIXTY-ONE
Received: On time
SPEAR BRISTOL
Recently registered
KNOWLE WEST BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
inHope (Bristol) Limited
Received: On time
PRODIGAL ARTS
Received: On time
FEEDING BRISTOL
Received: On time
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ROBERT SCOTT-COOK Trustee 14 May 2012
LIVING WATERS RADIO MINISTRY
Received: On time
GATE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
CLIFTON BETHESDA CHURCH LIMITED
Received: 12 days late