Dogfen lywodraethu JUBILEE HOUSE CARE TRUST LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ESTABLISH AND PROVIDE QUALITY CARE AND TRAINING TO THOSE WITH DISABILITIES, INCLUDING LEARNING DISABILITIES TO MAINTAIN OR IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND TO HELP THEM LIVE AS INDEPENDENTLY AS POSSIBLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE HERTFORDSHIRE)
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.