LIFELINE

Charity number: 298079
Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assisting victims of child abuse- past present or current. associated issues

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017

Total income: £550
Total expenditure: £450

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOR VICTIMS OF ABUSE (Working name)
  • LIFELINE - VICTIMS OF ABUSE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN DYAS Trustee
None on record
GORDON WELSH Trustee
None on record
DAVID CHINNERY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £1.09k £1.33k £749 £1.37k £550
Total expenditure £552 £1.21k £628 £1.12k £450
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1299 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WALNUT TREE HOUSE
MOOR END
HOLME ON SPALDING MOOR
YORKS
YO43 4DR
Phone:
01262469085
Website:

No information available