SHANKLIN RIFLE AND PISTOL CLUB

Charity number: 298130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required