SHANKLIN RIFLE AND PISTOL CLUB

Charity number: 298130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.95k £15.78k £16.61k £21.03k £38.33k
Total expenditure £10.27k £18.04k £19.94k £16.53k £11.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £21.48k