Accounts and annual returns OXTED AND LIMPSFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 298200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required