Trustees CAMBERLEY GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 298421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN ANDREW ALP Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Stephen John Masterson Trustee 01 March 2023
PARITY FOR DISABILITY
Received: On time
Simon Smalley Trustee 14 January 2019
None on record
Howard John Best Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
JANET ELIZABETH ALP Trustee 16 May 2012
None on record
LYNDA MAY FAIRBROTHER Trustee
None on record